Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vitzthum, Gregory Paul, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lester, Lois, Lester, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2004 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions3821 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time3821 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
December 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
November 12, 2004 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
|
January 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.