Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmahans Furniture, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Zavala, Miryan, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2004 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions4119 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time4123 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR A DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPERANCES CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
October 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
July 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Review COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK HICKS ALL PARTIES APPEARING CONTINUED FOR REVIEW Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court COMMISSIONER BERONIO CLERK MEADOWS ALL PARTIES APPEARING STIPULATION REACHED Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
March 18, 2004 | Docket Event | STIPULATION REACHED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.