Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
De Lemos, Ruth, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 1999 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED - LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: RETURNED FROM PLAINTIFF/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 18, 1999 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment DROPPED FR CALENDAR Notes: AT REQUEST OF: COURT NO SERVICE |
|
March 18, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL DUE TO NON SERVICE. Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
March 16, 1999 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: SHELF [DW] |
|
March 16, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF BRIAN DELEMOS RE: REQUEST TO DROP FROM CALENDAR DUE TO NON SERVICE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.