Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shaw, Tina, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Janene Beronio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 1999 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED - LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: RETURNED FROM PLAINTIFF/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: RETURNED FROM DEF/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: RETURED FROM PLAINTIFF/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
February 18, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL 2-18-99 JUDGE: JANENE BERONIO, CLERK: ACRIMMINS PLAINTIFF, TINA SHAW DEFENDANT ROBERT WALTON BOTH PARTIES BEING PRESENT MEDIATION AGREEMENT REACHED AND FILED BY PARTIES. Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
January 21, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: 1/12/99 TO ROBERT WALTON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.