Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Evans, Carl, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Shumaker, S. L., Shumaker, D. E., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Janene Beronio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 1998 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: RETURNED FROM PLAINTIFF/UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APP ORDER DISMISSED CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION SIGNED Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: UNABLE TO FORWARD FROM RESPONDENTS |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
February 18, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL 2-18-99 JUDGE: JANENE BERONIO, CLERK: ACRIMMINS PLAINTIFF: ACADIAN PROPERTIES, LISHA SHAW SWORN AND TESTIFIES DEFENDANTS, DAN AND SUE SHUMAKER, SWORN AND TESTIFIES PARTIES REACH STIPULATION DEFENDANTS ARE TO PAY PLAINTIFF 336.20 BY CHECK TODAY WHEN CHECK CLEARS PLAINTIFF TO FILE DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE. Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
January 26, 1999 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipt POS BY CERT MAIL-SC Notes: RECEIPT RETURNED, SIGNED ON 01/22/99 S.L. SHUMAKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.