Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Booth, Gary P, Booth, Maxine M, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Roseville Motor Co, Life Investors Ins, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 1998 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: Delay in Prosecution | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MTN TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECTUION GRANTED CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: FROM DEFENDANT AS UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
June 05, 1999 | Docket Event | CONVERSION NOTES Notes: CONVERTED CASE OLD CASE: Y-57-SC-98000234(SC1) | |
June 04, 1998 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Judge, Conversion |
|
May 11, 1998 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed CERT LTR RET UNCLMD Notes: UNDELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, FORWARDING ORDER EXPIRED |
|
May 06, 1998 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: RECEIVED: CHANGE OF VENUE LETTER FROM RO... ...SEVILLE MOTOR CORP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.