Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shannon R Powell, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Glen Osborn, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Beeson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Appeal Judgment
Date: March 16, 2021Order of Examination
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: September 30, 2020Small Claims Hearing
Date: August 06, 2020Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment
Date: June 30, 2020SC Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: June 19, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 08, 2020Small Claims Hearing
Date: June 03, 2020Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant
Date: December 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | Hearing | Order of Examination | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy of SC Judgment After Trial de Novo Appeal Judgment |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Appeal Filed | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Exhibits Received | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Reopened - Civil | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Exhibits Returned | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Master SC Minute Order Small Claims Hearing Judge: Alexander, Mark |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Under Submission
Judge: Alexander, Mark |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service- Mail NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING TIME Proof of Service - Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.