Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A-L Financial Corp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lacreshia N Williams, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Beeson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: Over 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Application and Order for Judgment Debtor Examination
Date: April 20, 2021Order of Examination
Date: April 26, 2023Memorandum of Costs
Date: May 11, 2020Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: September 12, 2018Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant
Date: July 30, 2018Order of Examination
Date: May 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Hearing | Order of Examination | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Master SC Minute Order Order of Examination Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Judgment Debtor Examination | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.