Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The County Of San Bernardino, Juanita Morales, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Ivan Yurits Bruno, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Michael J. Gassner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management208 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time147 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS FILE SCANNED/MCO Not Applicable |
|
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED AND FILED BACK Not Applicable |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PRO TEM FILED. Not Applicable |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION OF CS & HC (072011) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) - Minutes Pre-D Complete JUDGE PRO TEM: KHYMBERLI S APALOO PRESIDING CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS BAILIFF: JG MEDRANO NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY FATIMA ARIZA PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PETITIONER JUANITA MORALES PRESENT RESPONDENT IVAN YURITS BRUNO PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN RE: MODIFY CHILD SUPPT/HC FLD 072011 BY DCSS. MODIFICATION HEARING HELD. PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM. STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED. THE COURT ACCEPTS AND APPROVES STIPULATION AND ORDER. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM: KHYMBERLI S APALOO PRESIDING |
|
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: C/S $150 PER MONTH FILED. Not Applicable |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
UPDATE JURISDICTION TO KS. Not Applicable |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION OF CS & HC (072011) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: CS OFFICER FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO Not Applicable |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF NRPS BY MAIL ON 06/23/11 AS TO IVAN Y BRUNO, FILED. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.