Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anna Hall, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Robert Hall, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Robert A. Chrisman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1472 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1472 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/27/08 | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT FILING . Not Applicable |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT Not Applicable |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION FILED. (CONTESTED) Not Applicable |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: AFTER TRIAL - AFTER EVIDENCE BOTH SIDES BY COURT Not Applicable |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Action Dispo: Judgment JUDGE PRO TEM: ROBERT A. CHRISMAN PRESIDING CLERK: THERESA PARAMO NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER ANNA HALL PRESENT RESPONDENT ROBERT HALL PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. ACTION SETTLED AS TO ALL ISSUES. WITNESS -- ANNA & ROBERT HALL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE STATUTORY AND JURISDICTIONAL RESIDENT REQUIREMENTS ARE MET. COURT ACQUIRED JURISDICTION ON 10/26/07 BY FILING OF RESPONSE. DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDS: THERE ARE NO MINOR CHILDREN OF THIS MARRIAGE. BOTH PARTIES AGREE THAT THE DIVISION OF COMMUNITY PROPERTY & DEBTS IS FAIR AND EQUITABLE. SPOUSAL SUPPORT IS KNOWINGLY AND INTELLIGENTLY WAIVED BY ANNA HALL, ROBERT HALL. WRITTEN STIPULATION ON ALL ISSUES AS ATTACHED IS APPROVED BY COURT AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER BY REFERENCE AS THOUGH FULLY SET FORTH HEREIN,AND EACH OF THE PARTIES IS DIRECTED TO EXECUTE ALL THE PROVISIONS OF THAT ORDER. COPIES OF WHICH ARE SERVED THIS DATE. ALL EXISTING ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT. PETITIONER TO PREPARE FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE PRO TEM: ROBERT A. CHRISMAN PRESIDING |
|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM 1 DAY ESTIMATED TRIAL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO FAMILY LAW FILED 12/31/2003 OF ANNA HALL BY ROBERT HALL FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. Not Applicable |
|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DISSO BY MAIL ON 10/26/07 AS TO ANNA HALL, FILED. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.