Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jose M Gonzalez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Patricia Gomez Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR JOSE MEJIA GONZALEZ PAID BY JOSE M GONZALEZ IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00. Not Applicable |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Not Applicable | |
October 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: REVIEW OF CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION - Minutes Off Calendar ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE CLERK: DIANA FUENTES COURT REPORTER RHONDA BROWN 8134 BAILIFF: LISA STEPHENS - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JOSE M GONZALEZ PRESENT PATRICIA GOMEZ RODRIGUEZ APPEARS BY COURTCALL. SPANISH INTERPRETER CYNTHIA CAMPOS FOR MOTHER, DULY SWORN OR BY OATH ON FILE, PRESENT TO INTERPRET FOR THE WITNESS. ATTORNEY ABEL H FERNANDEZ PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW HEARING HELD 08:43 WITNESS -- JOSE M GONZALEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. COURT NOTES: BOTH PARTIES PRESENT AT THE LAST COURT HEARING. REVIEW FROM RFO BY MOTHER FILED 6/19/14. CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERS MADE 7/10/14. PARTIES NOT RE-REFERRED FOR REVIEW MEDIATION. - ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR MOTHER RE:MINORS THERAPY SESSIONS . ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY FATHER . AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : ALL EXISTING ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PURSUANT TO PARTIES STIPULATION. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: ARTHUR A HARRISON |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR FILING FEE, JOSE M GONZALEZ PAID BY JOSE M GONZALEZ IN THE AMOUNT OF $35.00. Not Applicable |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LODGMENT FILED BY PATRICIA GOMEZ RODRIGUEZ. Not Applicable |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINDING & ORDER AFTER HEARING; HEARING DATE: 07/10/14 FILED. Not Applicable |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF FINDING AND ORDER AFTER HEARING BY MAIL ON 07/11/14 AS TO JOSE M GONZALEZ, FILED. Not Applicable |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF JOSE M GONZALEZ IS DEN. DENIED |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED - DENIED. Not Applicable |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. PETITIONERS FEES $115 - Minutes Pre-D Complete ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE CLERK: CARNESHA BULLOCKS COURT REPORTER RHONDA BROWN 8134 BAILIFF: B PEDROZA - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JOSE M GONZALEZ PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: OSC/MOTION HELD. ACTION CAME ON FOR FEE WAIVER REQUEST RE: PETITIONER. ********CONFIDENTIAL HEARING****************** WITNESS -- JOSE M GONZALEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. AFTER REVIEW OF THE APPLICATION AND/OR INQUIRY OF THE APPLICANT, THE COURT DENIES THE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND ALLOWS MONTHLY PAYMENTS, SEE ORDER IN FILE FOR PAYMENT INFORMATION. ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: ARTHUR A HARRISON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.