Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ackerknecht, Joel, Ackerknecht, Kim, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ramirez, Felipe, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2011 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,501 To 5,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions137 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2012 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ORIGINALLY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF KIM ACKERKNECHT RETURNED TO SENDER |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ORIGINALLY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF KIM ACKERKNECHT RETURNED TO SENDER |
|
March 16, 2012 | Hearing |
Judgment for Plaintiff After Trial de Novo JUDGMENT FOR:PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT, JOEL ACKERKNECHT; KIM ACKERKNECHT JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEFENDANT/APPELLANT, FELIPE RAMIREZ PRINCIPLE: $2000.00 ATTORNEY FEES: $0.00 COSTS: $0.00 INTERESTS: $0.00 TOTAL: $2000.00 JUDGE JUDITH K DULCICH NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO MAILED TO ALL PARTIES THIS DATE |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Plaintiff After Trial de Novo JUDGMENT FOR:PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT, JOEL ACKERKNECHT; KIM ACKERKNECHT JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEFENDANT/APPELLANT, FELIPE RAMIREZ PRINCIPLE: $2000.00 ATTORNEY FEES: $0.00 COSTS: $0.00 INTERESTS: $0.00 TOTAL: $2000.00 JUDGE JUDITH K DULCICH NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO MAILED TO ALL PARTIES THIS DATE |
|
March 09, 2012 | Hearing |
NP1810 Department: AS Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL DE NOVO - SMALL CLAIMS THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KIM ACKERKNECHT (PL-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. FELIPE RAMIREZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ALSO PRESENT: STEVE GEER REAL ESTATE AGENT FOR THE PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. STEVE GEER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED AND SUBMITTED THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT FINDS FOR THE PLAINTIFF AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,000.00 EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF. PARTIES STIPULATE AS FOLLOWS: THAT THE EXHIBITS MAY BE RETURNED TO THE PARTIES OFFERING THEM THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 09, 2012 | Hearing |
4005 Trial De Novo - Small Claims Hearing Entered. |
|
March 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Trial De Novo
Judge: Dulcich, Judith K. |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
NP1810 Department: AS Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL DE NOVO - SMALL CLAIMS THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KIM ACKERKNECHT (PL-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. FELIPE RAMIREZ (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ALSO PRESENT: STEVE GEER REAL ESTATE AGENT FOR THE PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. STEVE GEER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED AND SUBMITTED THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT FINDS FOR THE PLAINTIFF AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,000.00 EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF. PARTIES STIPULATE AS FOLLOWS: THAT THE EXHIBITS MAY BE RETURNED TO THE PARTIES OFFERING THEM THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
4005 Trial De Novo - Small Claims Hearing Entered. |
|
February 09, 2012 | Hearing | NOTICE OF HEARING SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO ______________________________________________________________________________________ To Counsel of record for respective parties: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE HEARING AS HEREIN ABOVE INDICATED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER IS SET FOR 3/9/2012 AT 09:00AM IN DEPARTMENT AS, 325 CENTRAL VALLEY HWY, SHAFTER, CA 93263, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF KERN. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO ______________________________________________________________________________________ To Counsel of record for respective parties: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE HEARING AS HEREIN ABOVE INDICATED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED MATTER IS SET FOR 3/9/2012 AT 09:00AM IN DEPARTMENT AS, 325 CENTRAL VALLEY HWY, SHAFTER, CA 93263, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF KERN. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.