Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moser, Gene D, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Alisa R. Knight presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryProbate/Full Powers |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time681 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Order settling first & final account & report; authorizing compensation to executor and his attorney; and for final distribution pursuant to Will Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order settling first & final account & report; authorizing compensation to executor and his attorney; and for final distribution pursuant to Will Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
October 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting READY FOR HEARING Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 10/26/2016 Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting READY FOR HEARING Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
July 26, 2016 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Compliance Hearing NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE: 1. As of 6/2/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing. Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE: 1. As of 6/2/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing. Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
July 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Inventory with Property Tax Certificate Final: $403,808.36 |
|
July 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Final Account and Report and Petition for Distribution First & final account & report of executor; petition for authority to pay statutory fees; petition for final distribution pursuant to Will |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.