Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Balderas, Rosanna, Balderas, Paul, Balderas, Joamy, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Alisa R. Knight presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2014 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person Only - Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time662 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2015 | Hearing |
Compliance Hearing Order for termination Judge: Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Order for termination |
|
September 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Order Terminating Guardianship (JBSIS)
Judge: Wyatt, Ralph W. |
|
August 24, 2015 | Hearing |
4027 Review Hearing Entered. |
|
August 24, 2015 | Hearing |
Review READY FOR HEARING - REVIEW HEARING RE SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
4027 Review Hearing Entered. |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Review READY FOR HEARING - REVIEW HEARING RE SUSPENSION OF GUARDIANSHIP Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
June 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice Confidential gdn status report returned to Paul & Joamy Balderas via outbasket |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Confidential gdn status report returned to Paul & Joamy Balderas via outbasket |
|
June 15, 2015 | Hearing |
4201 Status Report Mailing PC 1513.2 Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: MAILING STATUS REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.