Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fair, Gail, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person Only - Relative |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time578 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2012 | Hearing |
4201 Status Report Mailing PC 1513.2 Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: STATUS REPORT MAILING |
|
November 27, 2012 | Hearing |
Status Report in re: PC 1513.2 STATUS REPORT MAILING Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
4201 Status Report Mailing PC 1513.2 Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: STATUS REPORT MAILING |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Status Report in re: PC 1513.2 STATUS REPORT MAILING Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
|
March 06, 2012 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys FORMER ATTORNEY: CAROL R BRACY NEW ATTORNEY: PRO PER |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys FORMER ATTORNEY: CAROL R BRACY NEW ATTORNEY: PRO PER |
|
March 02, 2012 | Hearing |
Probate
Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
|
February 23, 2012 | Hearing |
Letters of Guardianship PERSON : |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letters of Guardianship PERSON : |
|
February 17, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated in compliance ~ calid=1797549 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:03/02/2012, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:14, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:anitah, SystemDate:12/27/2011 2:25:39 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.