Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cano, Yasmin, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Wagner, Phillip Lee, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Gill, Susan M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2014 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time40 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2014 | Hearing |
Proof of Personal Service PET |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service PET |
|
September 29, 2014 | Hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for ROAH |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for ROAH |
|
September 26, 2014 | Hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS EXP 09/24/2017 |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS EXP 09/24/2017 |
|
September 24, 2014 | Hearing |
NP1105 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: YASMIN CANO (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. PARTIES STIPULATE TO WAIVE THE CLERK TAKING DOWN THE STIPULATION VERBATIM AND WILL RELY ON THE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO ISSUE RESTRAINING ORDERS. THESE WILL BE GRANTED ON THE SAME TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TEMPORARY ORDERS EXCEPT AS MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: . NO CONTACT ORDERS INCLUDE NO TEXTING. PETITIONER IS AWARDED PIXIE (DOG). FIREARM RESTRICTIONS ARE IN EFFECT. ORDER IS GOOD FOR THREE YEARS. PETITIONER TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
September 24, 2014 | Hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET DV/TRO |
|
September 24, 2014 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence PET DV/TRO Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET DV/TRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.