Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Aunter Riad Haddad, California Public Employees' Retirement System, State Of California Savings Plus Program 457 Defined Compensation Plan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Aimee Rayna Haddad, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Cannon, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCannon, Gloria Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions333 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2097 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RET'D VIA MAILRET'D VIA MAIL |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice NOTICE IF WITHDRAWAL: MISSING SIG ENV#06270901NOTICE IF WITHDRAWAL: MISSING SIG ENV#06270901 |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney E-FILED: Michael A. Carlovsky / NEW PRO PERE-FILED: Michael A. Carlovsky / NEW PRO PER |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
February 25, 2020 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HRG 1/9/2020HRG 1/9/2020 |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HRG 1/9/2020 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
February 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HRG 1/9/2020 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner 09/30/19 PET MOD C/V 2 MINORS CONT FROM 11/1/19 Judge: Cannon, Gloria |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment set by court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.