Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hamstreet, Kristopher K, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hamstreet, Kimberly D., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Stainfield, Bryan K. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Time To Trial189 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions209 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time976 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney MICHAEL R. KILPATRICK WITHDRAWN |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney MICHAEL R. KILPATRICK WITHDRAWN |
|
October 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HRG. 08/02/16 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HRG. 08/02/16 Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
September 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw RES NOM TO BE RELIEVED Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
August 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion Re: NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Hearing Date: 9/02/16 Hearing Time: 830AM Hearing Department/Division:B |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Re: NOM TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL Hearing Date: 9/02/16 Hearing Time: 830AM Hearing Department/Division:B |
|
August 11, 2016 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
August 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice MOTION TO BE RELIEVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.