Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Botello, Juan, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Botello, Andrea Limones, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Oglesby, John D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2014 |
CategoryPetition For Custody |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
September 04, 2018 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
August 24, 2018 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: F.L. THOMPSON New Attorney:DONNA DILLON |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: F.L. THOMPSON New Attorney:DONNA DILLON |
|
August 16, 2018 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
August 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR ORDER |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice REQUEST FOR ORDER |
|
July 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING: 6/21/17 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HEARING: 6/21/17 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
June 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER RECONSIDERATION HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.