Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hoven, Sherry Colina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hoven, Brian Lee, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Benavides, Jose R. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 26, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1570 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution Review 12/22/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR CONT FROM 01/08 *1 Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution Review 12/22/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR CONT FROM 01/08 *1 Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
January 17, 2018 | Hearing | Notice of Stay of Proceeding | |
January 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference CONT'D FROM 1/26/17, 4/13/17 AND 6/01/17 10/05/17 |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference CONT'D FROM 1/26/17, 4/13/17 AND 6/01/17 10/05/17 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution 12/22/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Family Centered Case Resolution 12/22/17 NOTICE OF HEARING FCCR Judge: Benavides, Jose R. |
|
December 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing HRG 1/08/18 DIV D |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing HRG 1/08/18 DIV D |
|
October 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Stipulation to Continue and Order NEW HEARING: 1/11/18 Judge: Stainfield, Bryan K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.