Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tracy Davis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alexandria Martinez Davis, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Marquez, Raymonda B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Raymonda B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Time To Trial275 days |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions362 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: August 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/2018 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 2/28/23 5/30/23 9/14/23 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/2018 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 2/28/23 5/30/23 9/14/23 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* |
|
September 14, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 5/27/22 8/01/22 11/09/22 2/28/23 5/30/23 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 5/27/22 8/01/22 11/09/22 2/28/23 5/30/23 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* |
|
June 06, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
May 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 5/27/22 8/01/22 11/09/22, 2/28/23 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 5/27/22 8/01/22 11/09/22, 2/28/23 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 5/27/22 8/01/22 11/09/22 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* |
|
February 28, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 5/27/22 8/01/22 11/09/22 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* Judge: Marquez, Raymonda B. |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 9/13/18 RES MOD C/C C/V STMNT OF DEC 3 MINORS CONTD 5/27/22 8/01/22 *STATUS OF PET. CRIMINAL MATTER* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.