Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mundy-Rosenblad, Lisa Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rosenblad, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Webster, Jason W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Respondent 5/12/21 RES 2107 MOTION Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Respondent 5/12/21 RES 2107 MOTION Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
May 13, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of service by mail | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of service by mail | |
May 12, 2021 | Hearing | Request for Order (FL-300) | |
March 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HRG: 01/20/21 Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HRG: 01/20/21 Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
February 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice FOAH POOR IMAGE QUALITY. ENVELOPE #5842820 |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice FOAH POOR IMAGE QUALITY. ENVELOPE #5842820 |
|
February 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING- DIVISION E IS NOW PAPERLESS. ALL E-FILINGS MUST BE STRAIGHT, CLEAR AND WITHOUT LINES. ENVELOPE #5821389 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.