Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gago, David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gago, Katie, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Stainfield, Bryan K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStainfield, Bryan K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Time To Trial538 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions882 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2239 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice Re Payment of Support FILED BY DCSS |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Payment of Support FILED BY DCSS |
|
June 07, 2013 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Document Image |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Document Image |
|
May 30, 2013 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS 5/30/2013 SDS |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS 5/30/2013 SDS |
|
February 15, 2013 | Hearing |
Reporter's Transcript OF PROCEEDINGS FROM 05/24/2012 |
|
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Transcript OF PROCEEDINGS FROM 05/24/2012 |
|
July 24, 2012 | Hearing |
Accounting PROCESS TRUST WITHDRAWAL $65 REFUND TO KATIE N GAGO 3102 AGNEW MEADOWS DR BAKERSFIELD, CA 93313 COMPLETED 7/24/12 |
|
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Accounting PROCESS TRUST WITHDRAWAL $65 REFUND TO KATIE N GAGO 3102 AGNEW MEADOWS DR BAKERSFIELD, CA 93313 COMPLETED 7/24/12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.