Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Soulek, Martha Rossiter, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Soulek, Bryce, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Susan M. Gill presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 23, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions644 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time783 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2012 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
February 08, 2012 | Hearing |
Judgment - Status Only STATUS ENDS 9/28/2011 SMG |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Status Only STATUS ENDS 9/28/2011 SMG |
|
February 02, 2012 | Hearing |
NP1060 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FAMILY LAW). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: J W HARROTT APPEARS ON BEHALF OF MARTHA ROSSITER SOULEK THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: COURT TAKES THE MATTER OFF CALENDAR. COURT FINDS THAT PARTIES HAD A STATUS ONLY JUDGMENT GRANTED IN AUGUST OF 2010 WITH NO JUDGMENT BEING PREPARED. PARTIES FILED A JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES SEPTEMBER 28, 2011. COURT ORDERS MR. HARROTT TO PREPARE THE STATUS ONLY JUDGMENT SHOWING HEARING DATE OF AUGUST 12, 2010 HEARD BY JUDGE GILL AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT. |
|
February 02, 2012 | Hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: CONT FROM 12/01/2011 |
|
February 02, 2012 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference CONT FROM 12/01/2011 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference CONT FROM 12/01/2011 Judge: Gill, Susan M. |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
NP1060 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FAMILY LAW). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: J W HARROTT APPEARS ON BEHALF OF MARTHA ROSSITER SOULEK THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: COURT TAKES THE MATTER OFF CALENDAR. COURT FINDS THAT PARTIES HAD A STATUS ONLY JUDGMENT GRANTED IN AUGUST OF 2010 WITH NO JUDGMENT BEING PREPARED. PARTIES FILED A JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES SEPTEMBER 28, 2011. COURT ORDERS MR. HARROTT TO PREPARE THE STATUS ONLY JUDGMENT SHOWING HEARING DATE OF AUGUST 12, 2010 HEARD BY JUDGE GILL AND SUBMIT TO THE COURT. |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: CONT FROM 12/01/2011 |
|
December 01, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1060 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FAMILY LAW). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: J W HARROTT APPEARS IN COURT WITHOUT MARTHA ROSSITER SOULEK (PE-1). NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 2/2/2012 AT 9:00 AM IN DIV/DEPT C FOR HEARING ON CAL: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONF BEFORE THE HON. JOHN L FIELDER OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. REASON FOR NEXT APPEARANCE: JUDGMENT PENDING SIGNATURE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.