Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Silas, Tracy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Silas, Thomas H, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with George R. Horrigan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2009 |
CategoryLegal Separation Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1014 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2296 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2015 | Hearing |
Copy of Interspousal Transfer Deed APN#347-101-04 SQUIRREL VALLEY PROPERTY |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Copy of Interspousal Transfer Deed APN#347-101-04 SQUIRREL VALLEY PROPERTY |
|
April 03, 2012 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
March 20, 2012 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney OLD ATTY: GEORGE R HORRIGAN |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney OLD ATTY: GEORGE R HORRIGAN |
|
March 15, 2012 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 08, 2012 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS 3/8/2012 JLF |
|
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS 3/8/2012 JLF |
|
February 23, 2012 | Hearing | Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
November 10, 2011 | Hearing |
NP1060 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (FAMILY LAW). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: TRACY SILAS (PE-1) APPEARS WITH GEORGE R HORRIGAN ESQ. THOMAS H SILAS (RE-1) APPEARS WITH FRANCIS LUTIE THOMPSON. PARTIES HAVE A FULL SETTLEMENT PROPERTY, AND VEHICLES AWARDED AS RECITED. CAMPING EQUIPMENT, FIFTH WHEEL AND BOAT AWARDED AS RECITED. FURNITURE AND FURNISHINGS AS AGREED BETWEEN PARTIES. PETITIONER TO KEEP HER RETIREMENT. RESPONDENT WAIVES ANY INTEREST/CLAIM IN IT. RESPONDENET TO KEEP HIS RETIREMENT. PETITIONER WAIVES ANY INTEREST/CLAIM IN IT. THE BIRD - GREEN WINGED MC CAA - IS AWARDED TO PETITIONER. SPOUSAL SUPPORT TERMINATED AS TO BOTH PARTIES EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. *************************************************************************************** PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. THE COURT FINDS THAT IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES HAVE ARISEN LEADING TO THE IRREMEDIABLE BREAKDOWN OF THE MARRIAGE. JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED. WIFE'S FORMER NAME RESTORED: FISHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.