Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pilja, Shawn Robert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Manzano, Yacenia, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Gill, Susan M. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 10, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions176 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time960 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2011 | Hearing |
Copies Forwarded to DCSS as Requested SCANNED TO STEPHANIE PEREZ FINAL JUDGMENT FILED 1/2/09 & FOAH FILED 8/25/08 |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Copies Forwarded to DCSS as Requested SCANNED TO STEPHANIE PEREZ FINAL JUDGMENT FILED 1/2/09 & FOAH FILED 8/25/08 |
|
January 20, 2009 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney TROY L CHILDERS WITHDRAWS |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney TROY L CHILDERS WITHDRAWS |
|
January 02, 2009 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
January 02, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS: 02/14/2009 JUDGE FIELDER |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dissolution STATUS ENDS: 02/14/2009 JUDGE FIELDER |
|
December 22, 2008 | Hearing | Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure | |
December 04, 2008 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice JUDGMENT RETURNED TO ATTORNEY TROY L. CHILDERS: MISSING PETITIONERS PRELIMINARY/ FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURES |
|
December 04, 2008 | Hearing | Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.