Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Galindo, Sarah, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Legan, Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Benavides, Jose R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2008 |
CategoryPetition For Custody |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2014 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing RLM 9/22/14 |
|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing RLM 9/22/14 |
|
September 26, 2014 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) List Document Image |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) List Document Image |
|
September 22, 2014 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND STANDARD ORDERS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CYNTHIA ESPINOSA APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY SARAH GALINDO. NO APPEARANCE BY NICHOLAS LEGAN. DCSS REPRESENTS THE DEPARTMENT MET AND CONFERRED WITH SARAH GALINDO (PE-1). THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: NICHOLAS LEGAN TO PAY THE SUM OF $166.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 07/01/2014. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE FIRST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. THE COURT ORDERS PAYMENT ON ARREARS TO BE SET/RESET IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 25.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. |
|
September 22, 2014 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: MOD CS HC STND ORDS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 7/7/2014 |
|
September 22, 2014 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) RE: MOD CS HC STND ORDS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 7/7/2014 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: MOD CS HC STND ORDS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 7/7/2014 |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND STANDARD ORDERS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CYNTHIA ESPINOSA APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY SARAH GALINDO. NO APPEARANCE BY NICHOLAS LEGAN. DCSS REPRESENTS THE DEPARTMENT MET AND CONFERRED WITH SARAH GALINDO (PE-1). THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: NICHOLAS LEGAN TO PAY THE SUM OF $166.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 07/01/2014. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE FIRST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. THE COURT ORDERS PAYMENT ON ARREARS TO BE SET/RESET IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 25.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) RE: MOD CS HC STND ORDS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 7/7/2014 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.