Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moreno, Darlene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moreno, Jose Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph L. McKnight, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2003 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3998 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2014 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing 3/27/14 RLM |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing 3/27/14 RLM |
|
March 27, 2014 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, STANDARD ORDERS, AND TO CONSOLIDATE WITH DA-746110. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RANDALL JOYCE APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER / DARLENE MORENO. JOSE MANUEL MORENO (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT ORDERS CASE NUMBER S-1501-DA-746110 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER S-1501-FL-586302 WITH CASE NUMBER S-1501-FL-586302 BEING THE LEAD CASE. SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. ATTACHED TO THE MOVING PAPERS. RESPONDENT / JOSE MANUEL MORENO TO PAY THE SUM OF $697.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 12/01/2013. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE 1ST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. THE COURT WAIVES REVIEW REQUIREMENT FOR APPROVAL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING AS TO FORM AND CONTENT BY PRO PER PARTIES APPEARING. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. THE COURT ORDERS PAYMENT ON ARREARS TO BE SET/RESET IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 50.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. |
|
March 27, 2014 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: MOD CS HC CONSOL W/ DA-746110 STND ORDS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 01/29/2014 |
|
March 27, 2014 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) RE: MOD CS HC CONSOL W/ DA-746110 STND ORDS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 01/29/2014 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, STANDARD ORDERS, AND TO CONSOLIDATE WITH DA-746110. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RANDALL JOYCE APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER / DARLENE MORENO. JOSE MANUEL MORENO (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT ORDERS CASE NUMBER S-1501-DA-746110 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER S-1501-FL-586302 WITH CASE NUMBER S-1501-FL-586302 BEING THE LEAD CASE. SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. ATTACHED TO THE MOVING PAPERS. RESPONDENT / JOSE MANUEL MORENO TO PAY THE SUM OF $697.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 12/01/2013. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE 1ST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. THE COURT WAIVES REVIEW REQUIREMENT FOR APPROVAL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING AS TO FORM AND CONTENT BY PRO PER PARTIES APPEARING. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. THE COURT ORDERS PAYMENT ON ARREARS TO BE SET/RESET IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 50.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: MOD CS HC CONSOL W/ DA-746110 STND ORDS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 01/29/2014 |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) RE: MOD CS HC CONSOL W/ DA-746110 STND ORDS - 1 MINORCONT'D FROM 01/29/2014 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
January 29, 2014 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, TO CONSOLIDATE WITH DA-746110 AND FOR STANDARD ORDERS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CYNTHIA ESPINOSA APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY DARLENE MORENO. NO APPEARANCE BY JOSE MANUEL MORENO. DCSS REPRESENTS THE DEPARTMENT MET AND CONFERRED WITH JOSE MANUEL MORENO (RE-1). CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 3/27/2014 AT 8:00 AM IN DIV/DEPT F FOR HEARING ON CAL: MOTION (DCSS) BEFORE THE HON. RALPH MCKNIGHT JR OR OTHER ASSIGNED JUDICIAL OFFICER. REASON FOR NEXT APPEARANCE: DUE TO INSUFFICIENT COURT TIME. |
|
January 29, 2014 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C CONSOLIDATE W/DA746110 STANDARD ORDERS1 MINOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.