Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gutierrez, Sandra, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gutierrez, Roman H, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with McKnight, Ralph presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 20, 2000 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order RLM |
|
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order RLM |
|
February 04, 2013 | Hearing | Cause Vacated; Stipulation / Order to be Filed by DCSS | |
February 04, 2013 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C1 MINOR |
|
February 04, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C1 MINOR |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
January 23, 2013 | Hearing |
Copies Provided as Requested COPIES JUDGMENT FILED 4/02/2001 DCSS |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Copies Provided as Requested COPIES JUDGMENT FILED 4/02/2001 DCSS |
|
December 28, 2012 | Hearing |
Copies Forwarded to DCSS as Requested JUDMGMENT FILED ON 4/2/01 COPIES MADE BY DCSS CLERKS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.