Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Baker, Ada, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Baker, Warner K, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Dawn O. Bittleston presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2007 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 6/14/07 JUDGE METTLER |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE 6/14/07 JUDGE METTLER |
|
June 14, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1085 Department: A Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ADA BAKER (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. WARNER K BAKER (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. DAWN BITTLESTON ESQ APPEARS FOR MINOR CHILD(REN). THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: MINOR COUNSEL RECITES RECOMMENDATION AS FOLLOWS: CURRENT CUSTODY TO REMAIN THE SAME. FATHER IS TO CONTINUED COUNSELING WITH MINOR CHILD. MINOR SHALL ATTEND COUNSELING. SUMMER VISITATION AS FOLLOWS: 6/14/07 THROUGH 6/22/07 WITH FATHER. 6/22/07 THROUGH 6/30/07 WITH MOTHER. MOTHER WEEKENDS IN JULY START ON THURSDAY ARE JULY 12 WEEKEND AND JULY 26 WEEKEND. 8/3/07 THROUGH 8/13/07 WITH MOTHER. SCHOOL STARTS ON AUGUST 16, 2007. ALTERNATE WEEKENDS SHALL BEGIN ON AUGUST 31, 2007. THE MOTHER SHALL HAVE THE 1ST, 3RD AND 5TH WEEKENDS. MINOR CHILD WILL HAVE CONJOINT COUNSELING WITH STEPMOTHER. CHRISTMAS SHALL BE DIVIDED IN THREE PARTS: FIRST: FRIDAY 12/21/07 AT 6PM UNTIL 12/25/07 NOON WITH MOTHER. SECOND: 12/25/07 NOON UNTIL JANUARY 1, 2008 AT NOON WITH FATHER. THIRD: JANUARY 1, 2008 NOON UNTIL THE SATURDAY BEFORE SCHOOL AT NOON WITH MOTHER. MOTHER SHALL HAVE MOTHER'S DAY. FATHER SHALL HAVE FATHER'S DAY. EASTER THE ENTIRE WEEK IN ODD YEARS WITH FATHER, EVEN YEARS WITH MOTHER. THE PARTIES ADOPT THE SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED. ALL PREVIOUS ORDERS MADE NOT SPECIFICALLY CHANGE REMAIN IN EFFECT. MINOR'S COUNSEL TO BE RELIEVED UPON EXECUTION OF ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
June 14, 2007 | Hearing |
4027 Review New Calendar |
|
June 14, 2007 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause REV C/C, C/V MATTER TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE METTLER Judge: Staley, H. A. "Skip" |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
4027 Review New Calendar |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1085 Department: A Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ADA BAKER (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. WARNER K BAKER (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. DAWN BITTLESTON ESQ APPEARS FOR MINOR CHILD(REN). THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: MINOR COUNSEL RECITES RECOMMENDATION AS FOLLOWS: CURRENT CUSTODY TO REMAIN THE SAME. FATHER IS TO CONTINUED COUNSELING WITH MINOR CHILD. MINOR SHALL ATTEND COUNSELING. SUMMER VISITATION AS FOLLOWS: 6/14/07 THROUGH 6/22/07 WITH FATHER. 6/22/07 THROUGH 6/30/07 WITH MOTHER. MOTHER WEEKENDS IN JULY START ON THURSDAY ARE JULY 12 WEEKEND AND JULY 26 WEEKEND. 8/3/07 THROUGH 8/13/07 WITH MOTHER. SCHOOL STARTS ON AUGUST 16, 2007. ALTERNATE WEEKENDS SHALL BEGIN ON AUGUST 31, 2007. THE MOTHER SHALL HAVE THE 1ST, 3RD AND 5TH WEEKENDS. MINOR CHILD WILL HAVE CONJOINT COUNSELING WITH STEPMOTHER. CHRISTMAS SHALL BE DIVIDED IN THREE PARTS: FIRST: FRIDAY 12/21/07 AT 6PM UNTIL 12/25/07 NOON WITH MOTHER. SECOND: 12/25/07 NOON UNTIL JANUARY 1, 2008 AT NOON WITH FATHER. THIRD: JANUARY 1, 2008 NOON UNTIL THE SATURDAY BEFORE SCHOOL AT NOON WITH MOTHER. MOTHER SHALL HAVE MOTHER'S DAY. FATHER SHALL HAVE FATHER'S DAY. EASTER THE ENTIRE WEEK IN ODD YEARS WITH FATHER, EVEN YEARS WITH MOTHER. THE PARTIES ADOPT THE SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED. ALL PREVIOUS ORDERS MADE NOT SPECIFICALLY CHANGE REMAIN IN EFFECT. MINOR'S COUNSEL TO BE RELIEVED UPON EXECUTION OF ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause REV C/C, C/V MATTER TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE METTLER Judge: Staley, H. A. "Skip" |
|
June 11, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1085 Department: A Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW RE: CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ADA BAKER (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. WARNER K BAKER (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: PETITIONER SHALL HAVE VISITATION WITH MINOR CHILD FROM TODAY UNTIL THURSDAY JUNE 14, 2007 CAUSE CONTINUED TO 6/14/2007 AT 8:30 AM IN DIVISION C. MATTER TO BE HEARD IN DIVISION A BY JUDGE METTLER. |
|
June 11, 2007 | Hearing |
4027 Review New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.