Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of San Bernardino, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Placencio, Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
CategoryForeign Support Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time349 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2012 | Hearing | CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH S-1501-FD-15035 (LEAD) | |
April 12, 2012 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: CONSOLIDATION WITH FD-15035, DETERMINATION OF CONTROLLING ORDER, AND SET PAYMENT ON ARREARS THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT/TIMOTHY PLACENCIO NO APPEARANCE BY OTHER PARENT/KEMBERLY PLACENCIO RANDALL JOYCE APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT ORDERS CASE NUMBER FD-15026 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER FD-15035 WITH CASE NUMBER FD-15035 BEING THE LEAD CASE. JUDGMENT ON CASE FD-15026 FROM 4/27/2000 SETTING SUPPORT AT $911.00 COMMENCING 3/01/2000 FOR PERIODS BACK TO 12/01/99 SHALL BE THE CONTROLLING ORDER UP TO JUDGMENT IN CASE FD-15035 SETTING CHILD SUPPORT AT $1,872.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING 7/01/2000. THE PORTION OF THE ORDER PRIOR TO THAT DATE COMMENCING SUPPORT ON 3/15/2000 IS NOT IN EFFECT. SUBSEQUENT ORDER IN FILE FD-15035 MODIFIES CHILD SUPPORT TO $666.00 PER MONTH UNSEGRAGATED COMMENCING 2/01/10. LATEST ORDER SETS CHILD SUPPORT AT $200.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING 9/01/2011 SEGRAGATED AS FOLLOWS: $40.00 TO THE OLDEST CHILD, $60.00 TO THE MIDDLE CHILD, AND $100.00 TO THE YOUNGEST CHILD. |
|
April 12, 2012 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM CONSOLIDATION WITH FD-15035, DETERMINATION OF CONTROLLING ORDER, SET PMT ON ARREARS 3 MINORS |
|
April 12, 2012 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM CONSOLIDATION WITH FD-15035, DETERMINATION OF CONTROLLING ORDER, SET PMT ON ARREARS 3 MINORS Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: CONSOLIDATION WITH FD-15035, DETERMINATION OF CONTROLLING ORDER, AND SET PAYMENT ON ARREARS THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT/TIMOTHY PLACENCIO NO APPEARANCE BY OTHER PARENT/KEMBERLY PLACENCIO RANDALL JOYCE APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT ORDERS CASE NUMBER FD-15026 CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBER FD-15035 WITH CASE NUMBER FD-15035 BEING THE LEAD CASE. JUDGMENT ON CASE FD-15026 FROM 4/27/2000 SETTING SUPPORT AT $911.00 COMMENCING 3/01/2000 FOR PERIODS BACK TO 12/01/99 SHALL BE THE CONTROLLING ORDER UP TO JUDGMENT IN CASE FD-15035 SETTING CHILD SUPPORT AT $1,872.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING 7/01/2000. THE PORTION OF THE ORDER PRIOR TO THAT DATE COMMENCING SUPPORT ON 3/15/2000 IS NOT IN EFFECT. SUBSEQUENT ORDER IN FILE FD-15035 MODIFIES CHILD SUPPORT TO $666.00 PER MONTH UNSEGRAGATED COMMENCING 2/01/10. LATEST ORDER SETS CHILD SUPPORT AT $200.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING 9/01/2011 SEGRAGATED AS FOLLOWS: $40.00 TO THE OLDEST CHILD, $60.00 TO THE MIDDLE CHILD, AND $100.00 TO THE YOUNGEST CHILD. |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM CONSOLIDATION WITH FD-15035, DETERMINATION OF CONTROLLING ORDER, SET PMT ON ARREARS 3 MINORS Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH S-1501-FD-15035 (LEAD) | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM CONSOLIDATION WITH FD-15035, DETERMINATION OF CONTROLLING ORDER, SET PMT ON ARREARS 3 MINORS |
|
February 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion FILED BY KCDCSS RE:CONSOLIDATION, DETERMINATION OF CONTROLLING ORDER, SET PMT ON ARREARS HEARING DATE:4/12/12 HEARING TIME:8:00A.M. HEARING DEPT/DIV:F ATTORNEY(S):DCSS |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion FILED BY KCDCSS RE:CONSOLIDATION, DETERMINATION OF CONTROLLING ORDER, SET PMT ON ARREARS HEARING DATE:4/12/12 HEARING TIME:8:00A.M. HEARING DEPT/DIV:F ATTORNEY(S):DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.