Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kern County Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Goode, Pamela, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time221 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Hearing |
Stipulation For Supplemental Judgment
Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
June 26, 2015 | Hearing | Notice of Acknowledgement and Receipt | |
June 26, 2015 | Hearing |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice STIP FOR SUPP JUDGMENT |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice STIP FOR SUPP JUDGMENT |
|
May 05, 2015 | Hearing |
DCSS: Judgment re Parental Obligations (After Hrg) RLM HRG 4/28/15 |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Judgment re Parental Obligations (After Hrg) RLM HRG 4/28/15 |
|
May 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Summons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL-FILED BY DCSS |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL-FILED BY DCSS |
|
April 28, 2015 | Hearing |
NP4178 Department: A |
|
April 28, 2015 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: A Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND STANDARD ORDERS. DCSS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KELLI KING APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY PAMELA GOODE. EVIDENCE PRESENTED - PETITIONER. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: DCSS: JUDGMENT OF PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS ESTABLISHED PAMELA GOODE DECLARED MOTHER OF BOTH CHILDREN. THE COURT ELECTS TO DEVIATE FROM GUIDELINE AND ORDERS PAMELA GOODE TO PAY THE SUM OF $250.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). SUPPORT IS SEGREGATED IN THE AMOUNT OF $95.00 AS TO THE OLDER CHILD AND $155.00 AS TO THE YOUNGER CHILD. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 01/01/2015. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE FIRST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. ATTACHED TO MOVING PAPERS. THE COURT ORDERS PAYMENT ON ARREARS TO BE SET/RESET IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 20.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.