Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Castro, Marco, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions246 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time2499 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 08/13/20 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 08/13/20 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
August 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 10/20/20 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 10/20/20 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
July 30, 2020 | Hearing | Notice of Registration of California Support Order | |
July 30, 2020 | Hearing | Notice Re Payment of Support | |
July 30, 2020 | Hearing | Statement of Registration of California Support Order FL-650 | |
July 17, 2020 | Hearing |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF CA SUPPORT ORDER (2ND REQUEST) |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF CA SUPPORT ORDER (2ND REQUEST) |
|
July 08, 2020 | Hearing |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF CA SUPPORT ORDER- FILED BY DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.