Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Ku, Chad Daniels, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Proof of Service by Mail FILED BY DCSS |
|
July 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice Re Payment of Support FILED BY DCSS |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail FILED BY DCSS |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Payment of Support FILED BY DCSS |
|
October 20, 2010 | Hearing |
Order After Hearing 10/06/10 RLM FILED BY DCSS |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing 10/06/10 RLM FILED BY DCSS |
|
October 06, 2010 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND PARENTAGE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JAY SMITH APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY CHAD DANIELS KU. NO APPEARANCE BY CONSTANCE MICHELLE BESHEARS. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: BASED ON DNA PARENTAGE STUDY, DATED 09/02/2010 AND FILED 09/14/2010, INDICATING MR. KU IS NOT EXCLUDED AS FATHER, THE COURT MAKES A FINDING OF PARENTAGE. RESPONDENT IS INCARCERATED. REDUCE CHILD SUPPORT TO ZERO, COMMENCING 07/01/2009, RESERVING JURISDICTION TO MAKE RETROACTIVE ORDERS BACK TO THE EFFECTIVE DATE, PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. STANDARD HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. |
|
October 06, 2010 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: JGMT, CS, HC & PARENTAGE-1 MINORCON'T FROM 8-19-10 |
|
October 06, 2010 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) RE: JGMT, CS, HC & PARENTAGE-1 MINORCON'T FROM 8-19-10 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: JGMT, CS, HC & PARENTAGE-1 MINORCON'T FROM 8-19-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.