Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Moore, Brandon S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 11/20/20 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 3 MINORS Judge: Cervantes, Gina |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 11/20/20 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 3 MINORS Judge: Cervantes, Gina |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED VIA DCSS COURIER |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED VIA DCSS COURIER |
|
November 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 3 MINORS Hearing Date: 02/10/21 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDERS 3 MINORS Hearing Date: 02/10/21 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
September 01, 2015 | Hearing |
DCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Supplemental
Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
September 01, 2015 | Hearing | Request to Enter Default | |
September 01, 2015 | Hearing | Declaration for Default | |
October 23, 2014 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Supplemental Summons / Complaint 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.