Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Miranda, Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2009 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions243 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2019 | Hearing | Request for Interpreter | |
May 21, 2012 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing 5/10/12 RLM |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing 5/10/12 RLM |
|
May 10, 2012 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT AND HEALTH CARE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KEITH CRAMER APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY ANTONIO MIRANDA. NO APPEARANCE BY LILIA M. GARNICA. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: ANTONIO MIRANDA TO PAY THE SUM OF $302.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 05/01/2012. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE 1ST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. ATTACHED TO MOVING PAPERS. SET PAYMENT ON ARREARS IN THE AMOUNT OF $15.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING 06/01/2012. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. |
|
May 10, 2012 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C 1 MINOR |
|
May 10, 2012 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT AND HEALTH CARE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KEITH CRAMER APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY ANTONIO MIRANDA. NO APPEARANCE BY LILIA M. GARNICA. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: ANTONIO MIRANDA TO PAY THE SUM OF $302.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 05/01/2012. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE 1ST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. ATTACHED TO MOVING PAPERS. SET PAYMENT ON ARREARS IN THE AMOUNT OF $15.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING 06/01/2012. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C 1 MINOR |
|
April 02, 2012 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion RE:DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C 1 MINOR HEARING DATE:05/10/12 HEARING TIME:0800F HEARING DEPT/DIV: ATTORNEY(S): |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.