Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Castillo, George, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 30, 2009 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions238 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment/Parental Obligations 11/10/09 RLM |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment/Parental Obligations 11/10/09 RLM |
|
November 10, 2009 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, AND PARENTAGE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT/GEORGE CASTILLO NO APPEARANCE BY OTHER PARENT/OFELIA SANABIA-LOPE LEPE JAY SMITH APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT ACCEPTS OFFER OF PROOF AND MAKES FINDING OF PARENTAGE RESPONDENT/GEORGE CASTILLO TO PAY THE SUM OF $214.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 4/1/2009. AND THE FIRST OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. |
|
November 10, 2009 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: CONT 10/2/09 DCSS MOTION JUDGMENT C/S H/C PARENTAGE |
|
November 10, 2009 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) CONT 10/2/09 DCSS MOTION JUDGMENT C/S H/C PARENTAGE Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: CONT 10/2/09 DCSS MOTION JUDGMENT C/S H/C PARENTAGE |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, AND PARENTAGE THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT/GEORGE CASTILLO NO APPEARANCE BY OTHER PARENT/OFELIA SANABIA-LOPE LEPE JAY SMITH APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT ACCEPTS OFFER OF PROOF AND MAKES FINDING OF PARENTAGE RESPONDENT/GEORGE CASTILLO TO PAY THE SUM OF $214.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 4/1/2009. AND THE FIRST OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) CONT 10/2/09 DCSS MOTION JUDGMENT C/S H/C PARENTAGE Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
October 02, 2009 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND PARENTAGE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JAY SMITH APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARENT AT CALENDAR CALL. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 11/10/2009 AT 8AM IN DIVISION F. REASON FOR NEXT APPEARANCE: TO ALLOW RESPONDENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. |
|
October 02, 2009 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.