Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against White, Teddy E, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order DCSS Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order DCSS Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
March 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 5/09/18 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 1 MINOR Hearing Date: 5/09/18 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
April 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney NIEVES RUBIO |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney NIEVES RUBIO |
|
December 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.