Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Lara Jr, Larry, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 12, 2006 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions141 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time2821 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2014 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing RLM 8/25/14 |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing RLM 8/25/14 |
|
August 25, 2014 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, AND STANDARD ORDERS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: TUMARA THELEN APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. DCSS REPRESENTS THE DEPARTMENT MET AND CONFERRED WITH LARRY LARA JR (RE-1). NO APPEARANCE BY OTHER PARENT / ANA D MERAZ *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. ATTACHED TO THE MOVING PAPERS RESPONDENT / LARRY LARA JR TO PAY THE SUM OF $114.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 07/01/2014. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE 1ST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. THE COURT WAIVES REVIEW REQUIREMENT FOR APPROVAL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING AS TO FORM AND CONTENT BY PRO PER PARTIES APPEARING. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. THE COURT ORDERS PAYMENT ON ARREARS TO BE SET/RESET IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 20.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. |
|
August 25, 2014 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STANDARD ORDERS1 MINOR |
|
August 25, 2014 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STANDARD ORDERS1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STANDARD ORDERS1 MINOR |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STANDARD ORDERS1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE, AND STANDARD ORDERS. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: TUMARA THELEN APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. DCSS REPRESENTS THE DEPARTMENT MET AND CONFERRED WITH LARRY LARA JR (RE-1). NO APPEARANCE BY OTHER PARENT / ANA D MERAZ *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: SEE STATE GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. ATTACHED TO THE MOVING PAPERS RESPONDENT / LARRY LARA JR TO PAY THE SUM OF $114.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 07/01/2014. CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL BE PAID ON THE 1ST OF EACH MONTH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT AND HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. THE COURT WAIVES REVIEW REQUIREMENT FOR APPROVAL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING AS TO FORM AND CONTENT BY PRO PER PARTIES APPEARING. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. THE COURT ORDERS PAYMENT ON ARREARS TO BE SET/RESET IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 20.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. |
|
July 01, 2014 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion DCSS HRG DATE; 08/25/2014 DIV F |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion DCSS HRG DATE; 08/25/2014 DIV F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.