Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Perrigo, Jack E, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2006 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2007 | Hearing | Stipulation for Judgment | |
April 26, 2007 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) New Calendar |
|
April 26, 2007 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S HEALTH CARE 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S HEALTH CARE 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) New Calendar |
|
March 08, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion RE: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S, HEALTH C ARE HEARING DATE: 04/26/07 HEARING TIME: 8:30 A.M. HEARING DEPT/DIV: "F"/300 |
|
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion RE: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S, HEALTH C ARE HEARING DATE: 04/26/07 HEARING TIME: 8:30 A.M. HEARING DEPT/DIV: "F"/300 |
|
February 09, 2007 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
January 18, 2007 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint SUMMONS/COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: JACK E. PAEEIGO HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: 01/10/07 |
|
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint SUMMONS/COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: JACK E. PAEEIGO HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: 01/10/07 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.