Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Gray, David L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with McKnight, Ralph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2005 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time2232 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2011 | Hearing |
DCSS: ResponseTo Governmental Notice of Motion or OSC HRG: 9/27/11 |
|
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
DCSS: ResponseTo Governmental Notice of Motion or OSC HRG: 9/27/11 |
|
October 12, 2011 | Hearing |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing 09/27/11 RLM |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
DCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing 09/27/11 RLM |
|
October 11, 2011 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO RESP BY MAIL, NO PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO RESP BY MAIL, NO PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
September 27, 2011 | Hearing |
NP4163 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DCSS MOTION IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT, HEALTH CARE AND FOR ZERO SUPPORT ORDER THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KELLI KING APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY DAVID L. GRAY. NO APPEARANCE BY MARTHA V. HERNANDEZ. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: RESPONDENT IS INCARCERATED. REDUCE CHILD SUPPORT TO ZERO, COMMENCING 08/05/2011, NON-PRORATED FOR THE MONTH OF AUGUST, RESERVING JURISDICTION TO MAKE RETROACTIVE ORDERS BACK TO THE EFFECTIVE DATE, PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. STANDARD HEALTH INSURANCE ORDERS TO ISSUE. EACH PARTY SHALL PAY ONE-HALF OF ALL UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL EXPENSES REGARDING THE MINOR CHILD(REN), PURSUANT TO THE STATUTORY SCHEME. DCSS: COURT ORDERS CONDITIONAL STAY ORDERS AS PROVIDED IN FAM CODE 4007.5. |
|
September 27, 2011 | Hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C $0 SUPPORT 1 MINOR |
|
September 27, 2011 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C $0 SUPPORT 1 MINOR Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C $0 SUPPORT 1 MINOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.