Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dcss, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Bolton, Ryan M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2005 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions146 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time943 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2008 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order RLM |
|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order RLM |
|
April 29, 2008 | Hearing |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
April 29, 2008 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) RES NOM SET ASIDE FIN PROVISION ON OAH Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) RES NOM SET ASIDE FIN PROVISION ON OAH Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
April 01, 2008 | Hearing | Responsive Declaration | |
March 19, 2008 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion RE: RES NOM SET ASIDE FIN PROVISIONS ON OAH HEARING DATE: 04/29/2008 HEARING TIME: 8:00AM HEARING DEPT/DIV: F |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion RE: RES NOM SET ASIDE FIN PROVISIONS ON OAH HEARING DATE: 04/29/2008 HEARING TIME: 8:00AM HEARING DEPT/DIV: F |
|
December 26, 2007 | Hearing |
Order After Hearing 12/18/07 JRB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.