Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Kern Dafs, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Crowell, Robert Harold, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph L. McKnight, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph L. McKnight, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2000 |
CategoryChild Support-Department Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Cycle Time2408 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2007 | Hearing |
Order After Hearing OAH 6/18/07 RLM |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing OAH 6/18/07 RLM |
|
June 18, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1070 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S MOTION RE: EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: COLIN GLENN APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARENT ROBERT HAROLD CROWELL (RE-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. BARBARA F CHRISTENSEN (PO-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: SET PAYMENT ON ARREARS IN THE AMOUNT OF $115.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. MR. CROWELL'S DRIVER'S LICENSE WILL BE RELEASED UPON PAYMENT OF $250.00, TO BE PAID BY 06/22/2007. ONLY ONE $250.00 PAYMENT REQUIRED BETWEEN THE TO CASES; DA-757121 AND PT-21828, TO HAVE LICENSE RELEASED. |
|
June 18, 2007 | Hearing |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
June 18, 2007 | Hearing |
Motion (DCSS) CONT 4-23-07 RES REQUEST FOR HEARING EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
June 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1070 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S MOTION RE: EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: COLIN GLENN APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARENT ROBERT HAROLD CROWELL (RE-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. BARBARA F CHRISTENSEN (PO-1) APPEARED IN ROOM 300 WITH DCSS REPRESENTATIVE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: SET PAYMENT ON ARREARS IN THE AMOUNT OF $115.00 PER MONTH COMMENCING FORTHWITH. WAGE ASSIGNMENT TO ISSUE. MR. CROWELL'S DRIVER'S LICENSE WILL BE RELEASED UPON PAYMENT OF $250.00, TO BE PAID BY 06/22/2007. ONLY ONE $250.00 PAYMENT REQUIRED BETWEEN THE TO CASES; DA-757121 AND PT-21828, TO HAVE LICENSE RELEASED. |
|
June 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) CONT 4-23-07 RES REQUEST FOR HEARING EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
June 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
April 23, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1070 Department: F Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S MOTION RE: EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JAY SMITH APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES. NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARENT CAUSE CONTINUED TO 6/18/2007 AT 8:30 AM IN DIVISION F. |
|
April 23, 2007 | Hearing |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.