Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Abarquez, Delia Padilla, Orozco, Ilda Padilla, Padilla, Manuel, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2008 |
CategoryProbate/Full Powers |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time770 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2010 | Hearing |
Probate Calendar Notes: NOT READY FOR HEARING Tentative Ruling: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 11/1/10, the Order After Hearing has been filed.NOT READY FOR HEARING Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Probate Calendar Notes: NOT READY FOR HEARING Tentative Ruling: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 11/1/10, the Order After Hearing has been filed.NOT READY FOR HEARING Judge: Wyatt, Ralph Wm. |
|
November 04, 2010 | Hearing |
Judgment and Order for Final Distribution COMMISSSIONER RALPH WM WYATT |
|
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment and Order for Final Distribution COMMISSSIONER RALPH WM WYATT |
|
November 03, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated 11/5/10 Compliance hearing vacated. ~ calid=1389484 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:11/05/2010, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:8, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:shellyw, SystemDate:11/1/2010 4:33:35 PM |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated 11/5/10 Compliance hearing vacated. ~ calid=1389484 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4144, CourtDate:11/05/2010, Courtroom:P, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:8, SessionType:PBC, Judge:RWW, Deputy:shellyw, SystemDate:11/1/2010 4:33:35 PM |
|
November 01, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER DIRECTING FINAL DISTRIBUTION; SIGNATURE MISSING ON PROOF OF SERVICE MICHAEL YOUNG LAW OFFICES OF YOUNG & NICHOLS FOR: ILDA PADILLA OROZCO |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER DIRECTING FINAL DISTRIBUTION; SIGNATURE MISSING ON PROOF OF SERVICE MICHAEL YOUNG LAW OFFICES OF YOUNG & NICHOLS FOR: ILDA PADILLA OROZCO |
|
October 23, 2010 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER DIRECTING FINAL DISTRIBUTION - ORDER DOES NOT INCLUDE ATTY HULSY'S FEES WAIVED MICHAEL YOUNG LAW OFFICES OF YOUNG & NICHOLS FOR: ILDA PADILLA OROZCO |
|
October 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER DIRECTING FINAL DISTRIBUTION - ORDER DOES NOT INCLUDE ATTY HULSY'S FEES WAIVED MICHAEL YOUNG LAW OFFICES OF YOUNG & NICHOLS FOR: ILDA PADILLA OROZCO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.