Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Long, Aimee, Long, Cari, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Lewis, Leslie, Lewis, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Ralph W. Wyatt presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management232 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2008 |
CategoryTrust-Probate |
Time To Trial242 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER OUT BASKET |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ORDER OUT BASKET |
|
August 17, 2010 | Hearing | Notice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted | |
June 19, 2009 | Hearing |
4144 Compliance Hearing New Calendar |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
4144 Compliance Hearing New Calendar |
|
June 10, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing Vacated HEARING 6/19/09 VACATED - IN COMPLIANCE RECEIPT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS PAYABLE TO CARI AND AIMEE LONG FILED 5/19/09 |
|
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated HEARING 6/19/09 VACATED - IN COMPLIANCE RECEIPT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS PAYABLE TO CARI AND AIMEE LONG FILED 5/19/09 |
|
May 19, 2009 | Hearing |
Receipt OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS AND COMPLIANCE WITH STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Receipt OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS AND COMPLIANCE WITH STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
May 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice SUB OF ATTY -- RETURNED TO WILLIAM D OLCOTT -- NOT AN ORIGINAL SIGNATURE, NEED TO USE REVISED FORM, MUST USE PAGE 2. OUT BASKET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.