Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rubio De Jimenez, Graciela, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Louie L. Vega presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouie L. Vega Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2007 |
CategoryOther Probate With One Hearing |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2008 | Hearing |
Accounting WITHDRAWAL OF $320.00 TO STEWART, GREEN & McGOWAN LAW OFFICES COMPLETED. KC |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Accounting WITHDRAWAL OF $320.00 TO STEWART, GREEN & McGOWAN LAW OFFICES COMPLETED. KC |
|
February 14, 2008 | Hearing |
152 Pmt: Court Trust Amount of $320.00 for RUBIO DE JIMENEZ, GRACIELA (PE-1). Received from ANNE D MCGOWAN, check no(s) 1154. Receipt #369819 for amount of $320.00. |
|
February 14, 2008 | Hearing |
882 PMT: Probate Petition Commencing Other Proceedings Receipt #329284 entered by Deputy #522 on 08/01/2007 4:44:50 PM in the amount of $320.00 voided due to CHANGE IN FEE CODE; voided by Deputy #550 on 02/14/2008 at 9:16:45 AM with void transaction #369812. |
|
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
152 Pmt: Court Trust Amount of $320.00 for RUBIO DE JIMENEZ, GRACIELA (PE-1). Received from ANNE D MCGOWAN, check no(s) 1154. Receipt #369819 for amount of $320.00. |
|
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
882 PMT: Probate Petition Commencing Other Proceedings Receipt #329284 entered by Deputy #522 on 08/01/2007 4:44:50 PM in the amount of $320.00 voided due to CHANGE IN FEE CODE; voided by Deputy #550 on 02/14/2008 at 9:16:45 AM with void transaction #369812. |
|
November 09, 2007 | Hearing |
Letter Received LETTER FROM: STEWART GREEN & MCGOWAN DATE OF LETTER: 11/6/07 RE: MATTER DROPPED |
|
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter Received LETTER FROM: STEWART GREEN & MCGOWAN DATE OF LETTER: 11/6/07 RE: MATTER DROPPED |
|
November 08, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1240 Department: E Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITION FOR : BY SURVIVING SPOUSE TO DETERMINE CHARACTER OF REAL PROPERTY; PETITION CONFIRMING REAL PROPERTY AS COMMMUNITY PROPERTY TO SURVIVING SPOUSE AND FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING THE TRANSFER OF REAL PROPERTY TO PETITIONER AS COMMUNITY PROPERTY PER PROBATE CODE 850(a)(3)(A),100,101. NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER GRACIELA RUBIO DE JIMENEZ OR COUNSEL ANNE D MCGOWAN. *************************************************************************************** MATTER DROPPED . |
|
November 08, 2007 | Hearing |
4011 Petition New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.