Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Colbert, Christina, Colbert, Janie Faye, Lynch, John, Lynch, Yvonne, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Alisa R. Knight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlisa R. Knight Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management3813 days |
Filing DateApril 30, 2003 |
CategoryGuardianship Of The Person Only - Relative |
Time To Trial4130 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time4865 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Court Trial Petition for termination of guardianship Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petition for termination of guardianship Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
August 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference re: petition for terminiation of guardianship Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference re: petition for terminiation of guardianship Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
June 29, 2016 | Hearing | Notice of Change Name/Address | |
April 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered Minute order dated 04/12/2016 |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered Minute order dated 04/12/2016 |
|
April 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference READY FOR HEARING - Petition for termination of guardianship Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference READY FOR HEARING - Petition for termination of guardianship Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
December 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference READY FOR HEARING Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.