Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Family Court Services, Hulsy, James R, Kern County Public Defender, Kern County Superior Court, Wolf, Debra, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Alisa R. Knight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlisa R. Knight Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2000 |
CategoryConservatorship-Probate |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time6390 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Supplement to Investigator's Report |
|
May 30, 2018 | Hearing | Status Review Investigation Report | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Supplement to Investigator's Report |
|
December 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Compliance Hearing NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 12/10/15, the Order After Hearing has not been submitted for filing. Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 12/10/15, the Order After Hearing has not been submitted for filing. Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
December 29, 2015 | Hearing |
Judgment and Order Settling Account Order on sixth account, report and petition of conservator, petition for its settlement may 1, 2014 through June 18, 2015, and for closing of conservatorship estate Judge: Wyatt, Ralph W. |
|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment and Order Settling Account Order on sixth account, report and petition of conservator, petition for its settlement may 1, 2014 through June 18, 2015, and for closing of conservatorship estate Judge: Wyatt, Ralph W. |
|
October 07, 2015 | Hearing |
Final Accounting NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. Withdrawal amount on bank statement does not match amount on Schedule C - Disbursement ($17,247.60 v. $17,250.91). Need explanation by way of verified supplement. Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Accounting NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. Withdrawal amount on bank statement does not match amount on Schedule C - Disbursement ($17,247.60 v. $17,250.91). Need explanation by way of verified supplement. Judge: Knight, Alisa R. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing Cover Sheet to Debra Wolf's Supplemental Declaration RE Probate Note on Sixth Account |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.