Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChapin, Sidney P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial460 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time471 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2016 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
April 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) Request for Dismissal of Cross-Complaint |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) Request for Dismissal of Cross-Complaint |
|
April 05, 2016 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) As to complaint filed by Teresa Lynn Fairbanks only, with prejudice. |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) As to complaint filed by Teresa Lynn Fairbanks only, with prejudice. |
|
April 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 5 DAYS (JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES) Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E 5 DAYS (JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES) Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
March 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference T/E 5 DAYS TD 4/4/2016 (JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES) Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference T/E 5 DAYS TD 4/4/2016 (JURY REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES) Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
March 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) As to complaint filed by Teresa Lynn Fairbanks, without prejudice. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.