Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dhaliwal, Hardeep Singh, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Kumpel, Frederick, against Singh, Jagdeep, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
Category43-Ch Civil Harassment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time391 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Post-Disposition) why order should not be modified to instate firearm restrictions. Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Post-Disposition) why order should not be modified to instate firearm restrictions. Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
January 13, 2016 | Hearing | Ruling | |
January 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Letter Received Letter From: Tami M. Krenzin, Attorney General Date of Letter: 1/5/16 Re: The Order to Show Cause hearing on 1/14/16 |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Received Letter From: Tami M. Krenzin, Attorney General Date of Letter: 1/5/16 Re: The Order to Show Cause hearing on 1/14/16 |
|
December 31, 2015 | Hearing |
Statement Re: Order to Show Cause Submitted by Fredrick C. Kumpel, Esq. |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Statement Re: Order to Show Cause Submitted by Fredrick C. Kumpel, Esq. |
|
December 18, 2015 | Hearing | Notice of Order to Appear | |
October 26, 2015 | Hearing | Ruling | |
October 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Letter Received Letter From: Kamala D. Harris Date of Letter: 10/1/15 Re: Civil Harassment Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.